OK HB2486 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous HB2486

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2022 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-04-13 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Oklahoma Public Employees Retirement System; increasing employer matching amount; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Oklahoma Public Employees Retirement System; increasing employer matching amount; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Retirement And Insurance: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 68 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-04-13SenateTitle stricken
2022-04-13SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
2022-04-11SenateReferred to Appropriations
2022-04-11SenateTitle restored
2022-04-11SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
2022-03-29SenateSecond Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2022-03-28SenateFirst Reading
2022-03-28HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2022-03-24HouseReferred for engrossment
2022-03-24HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 68 Nays: 23
2022-03-24HouseTitle stricken
2022-03-24HouseAmended
2022-03-24HouseAuthored by Senator Pemberton (principal Senate author)
2022-03-24HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Randleman
2022-03-24HouseGeneral Order
2021-03-01HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
2021-02-02HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2021-02-01HouseAuthored by Representative Frix
2021-02-01HouseFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

HB2486 (Carry Over) 2021-03-01 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb2486&Session=2200
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20INT/hB/HB2486%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB2486%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/HFLR/HB2486%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENGR/hB/HB2486%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCSH/HB2486%20SCSH.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/SFLR/HB2486%20SFLR.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20AMENDMENTS/House/HB2486%20FULLPCS1%20AVERY%20FRIX-MAH.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/House/HB2486%20FA1%20OSBURNMI-CC.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20AMENDMENTS/Senate/HB2486%20PCS.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/Senate/HB2486%20(4-27-22)%20(PEMBERTON)%20RT%20FA1.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2486%20CS%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2486%20FULLPCS1%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/impact%20statements/oplaa%20actuarial/house/HB2486%20CS%20AO.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/impact%20statements/oplaa%20actuarial/house/HB2486%20FULLPCS1%20AO.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/impact%20statements/oplaa%20actuarial/Senate/HB2486%20CS%20AO.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/HB2486%20CS%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB2486_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB2486_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback