OK HB2478 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2478
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 25 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 25 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Custody; creating Alanda's Law; temporary order for support, custody and visitation; domestic abuse; effective date.
Title
Custody; creating Alanda's Law; temporary order for support, custody and visitation; domestic abuse; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Sent to Governor |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2024-04-25 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2024-04-24 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2024-04-24 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2024-03-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-03-18 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-03-13 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-13 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 1 |
2024-03-13 | House | Amended by floor substitute |
2024-03-13 | House | Authored by Senator Gollihare (principal Senate author) |
2024-03-13 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) West (Tammy) |
2024-03-13 | House | General Order |
2024-02-28 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2024-02-26 | House | Remove Representative Hill as principal House author and substitute with Representative Harris |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Hill |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2478 (Carry Over) 2023-02-07 - Second Reading referred to Rules