OK HB2476 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Cities and towns; general powers of municipalities; modifying notice requirement; effective date.
Title
Cities and towns; general powers of municipalities; modifying notice requirement; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-25 | Approved by Governor 04/25/2012 | |
2012-04-19 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-04-19 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-04-19 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2012-04-18 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-04-18 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-04-18 | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 0 | |
2012-04-18 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-03-28 | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed | |
2012-03-21 | Second Reading referred to General Government | |
2012-03-15 | First Reading | |
2012-03-15 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-03-14 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-14 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 5 | |
2012-03-14 | Amended | |
2012-03-14 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sherrer | |
2012-03-14 | General Order | |
2012-03-01 | Authored by Senator Johnson (Rob) (principal Senate author) | |
2012-03-01 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Scott | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |