OK HB2472 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Approved by Governor 05/24/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Railroads; prohibiting certain acts by operators of trains; providing penalty; providing for certain administrative hearing; requiring of certain report; effective date; emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Railroads; prohibiting certain acts by operators of trains; providing penalty; providing for certain administrative hearing; requiring of certain report; effective date; emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 34 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 82 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23HouseApproved by Governor 05/24/2019
2019-05-23HouseSent to Governor
2019-05-23SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2019-05-23HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2019-05-22HouseReferred for enrollment
2019-05-22SenateEmergency passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 9
2019-05-22SenateMeasure passed, to House: Ayes: 34 Nays: 11
2019-05-22SenateCCR adopted
2019-05-20SenateCCR read
2019-05-20HouseTo Senate
2019-05-20HouseFourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 3
2019-05-20HouseCCR adopted
2019-05-16HouseEmergency added
2019-05-16HouseTitle restored
2019-05-16HouseCCR submitted
2019-05-14HouseHC's changed: Withdrawn from Conference Committee on Transportation and naming Conference Committee on Rules
2019-05-13SenateConference granted, SCs named Smalley, Treat, Simpson, David, Dossett, Young
2019-05-02HouseSA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Transportation
2019-04-29HouseSA's received
2019-04-29SenateEngrossed to House
2019-04-25SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-04-25SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 5
2019-04-25SenateTitle stricken
2019-04-25SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2019-04-11SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules committee; CR filed
2019-04-10SenateRemove as author Senator Simpson; authored by Senator Smalley
2019-04-10SenateReferred to Rules
2019-04-10SenateWithdrawn from Transportation committee
2019-04-09SenateFailed in Committee - Transportation
2019-03-26SenateSecond Reading referred to Transportation
2019-02-21SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-21HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-02-20HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-02-20HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 5
2019-02-20HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Marti, Davis
2019-02-20HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-13HouseAuthored by Senator Simpson (principal Senate author)
2019-02-13HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Hardin (Tommy), Hilbert
2019-02-13HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation Committee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Transportation
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative McCall
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb2472&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/hB/HB2472%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB2472%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/HB2472%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/hB/HB2472%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCSH/HB2472%20SCSH.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/HB2472%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB2472%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCCS/HB2472%20CCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENR/hB/HB2472%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB2472_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB2472_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback