OK HB2459 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2459
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-26 - Approved by Governor 06/07/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-26 - Approved by Governor 06/07/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; Filmed in Oklahoma Act of 2021; modifying incentive related to certain post production activity; logo; effective date; emergency.
Title
Revenue and taxation; Filmed in Oklahoma Act of 2021; modifying incentive related to certain post production activity; logo; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Hill [R] | Sen. Chuck Hall [R] | Rep. Kevin McDugle [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-25 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 73 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Finance: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 73 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Finance: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-26 | House | Approved by Governor 06/07/2023 |
2023-05-26 | House | Sent to Governor |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2023-05-26 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2023-05-25 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2023-05-25 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2023-05-24 | Senate | CCR read |
2023-05-24 | House | To Senate |
2023-05-24 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 17 |
2023-05-24 | House | CCR adopted |
2023-05-22 | House | Title restored |
2023-05-22 | House | CCR submitted |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Hall, Rader, Howard, Murdock, Thompson (Roger), Montgomery, Kirt |
2023-05-18 | House | HC's named: Conference Committee on Rules |
2023-05-17 | House | Naming of conferees rescinded |
2023-05-15 | House | HC's named: Conference Committee on Rules |
2023-05-08 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later |
2023-05-01 | House | SA's received |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 3 |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Title stricken |
2023-04-27 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Placed on General Order |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Withdrawn from Appropriations committee |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Finance committee; CR filed |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2023-03-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-21 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2023-03-20 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-20 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 8 |
2023-03-20 | House | Amended by floor substitute |
2023-03-20 | House | House Rule suspended |
2023-03-20 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) McDugle |
2023-03-20 | House | General Order |
2023-03-02 | House | Emergency added |
2023-03-02 | House | Authored by Senator Hall (principal Senate author) |
2023-03-02 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Hill |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2459 (Carry Over) 2023-05-26 - Approved by Governor 06/07/2023