OK HB2446 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2446
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-21 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Children, Youth and Family Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-21 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Children, Youth and Family Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Children; Office of Juvenile Affairs; responsibility; Division Directors; effective date.
Title
Children; Office of Juvenile Affairs; responsibility; Division Directors; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Cyndi Munson [D] | Sen. Kay Floyd [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-15 - House - House: Children, Youth and Family Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-21 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Children, Youth and Family Services Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Children, Youth and Family Services |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Munson |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2446 (Carry Over) 2021-02-02 - Second Reading referred to Children, Youth and Family Services