OK HB2440 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Court; modifying number of district court judges for certain districts; effective date; emergency.
Title
Court; modifying number of district court judges for certain districts; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Dale DeWitt [R] | Sen. Bryce Marlatt [R] | Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D] | Sen. Jabar Shumate [D] |
Rep. Aaron Stiles [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-14 - House - House: Conference Committee on Redistricting: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: RECONSIDER EMERGENCY (Y: 67 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 62 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 64 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - House: Committee on Redistricting: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: RECONSIDER EMERGENCY (Y: 67 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 62 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 64 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - House: Committee on Redistricting: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-25 | Died in conference | |
2012-05-08 | Conference granted, SCs named Marlatt, Sykes, Nichols, Jolley, Burrage, Sparks | |
2012-05-02 | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Redistricting | |
2012-04-30 | SA's received | |
2012-04-30 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-04-25 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-04-25 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 8 | |
2012-04-25 | Title restored | |
2012-04-25 | General Order, Amended | |
2012-04-09 | Title stricken | |
2012-04-09 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed | |
2012-04-02 | Referred to Judiciary | |
2012-04-02 | Withdrawn from Redistricting committee | |
2012-03-20 | Referred to Redistricting | |
2012-03-20 | Withdrawn from Judiciary committee | |
2012-03-08 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2012-03-01 | First Reading | |
2012-03-01 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-02-29 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-02-29 | Emergency passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 14 | |
2012-02-29 | Motion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 67 Nays: 12 | |
2012-02-28 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Stiles | |
2012-02-28 | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 64 Nays: 23; Ayes: 62 Nays: 27 | |
2012-02-28 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Pittman, Shumate, Stiles | |
2012-02-28 | General Order | |
2012-02-20 | Authored by Senator Marlatt (principal Senate author) | |
2012-02-20 | CR; Do Pass Redistricting Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Redistricting | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative DeWitt | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 91 | 15d | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 92 | 15b | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 92 | 15c | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 92 | 22 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 92 | 23 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 92 | 8b | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 92 | 8d | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 98 | 8e | Amended Code | See Bill Text |