OK HB2437 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/05/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/05/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Insurance; creating the Health Carrier Access Payment Revolving Fund for the Oklahoma Health Care Authority; stating purpose of fund. Effective date.
Title
Insurance; creating the Health Carrier Access Payment Revolving Fund for the Oklahoma Health Care Authority; stating purpose of fund. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Ed Cannaday [D] | Rep. Doug Cox [R] | Sen. Mike Johnson [R] | Rep. Lucky Lamons [D] |
Rep. Scott Martin [R] | Rep. Ken Miller [R] | Sen. David Myers [R] | Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-05-24 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 67 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-05-24 - House - House: TABLE MOTION (Y: 54 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-05-24 - House - House: D (Y: 53 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2010-05-24 - House - House: (Y: 44 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2010-05-24 - House - House: (Y: 65 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2010-05-24 - House - House: TABLE RECON (Y: 28 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2010-05-21 - House - House: R (Y: 73 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2010-05-21 - House - House: TABLE (Y: 57 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2010-05-21 - House - House: (Y: 60 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - House - House: (Y: 87 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2010-05-24 - House - House: TABLE MOTION (Y: 54 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-05-24 - House - House: D (Y: 53 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2010-05-24 - House - House:
2010-05-24 - House - House:
2010-05-24 - House - House: TABLE RECON (Y: 28 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2010-05-21 - House - House: R (Y: 73 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2010-05-21 - House - House: TABLE (Y: 57 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2010-05-21 - House - House:
2010-02-03 - House - House: (Y: 87 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Approved by Governor 06/05/2010 | |
2010-05-24 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-24 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-05-24 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2010-05-24 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-24 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 29 Nays: 14 | |
2010-05-24 | Ayes: 29 Nays: 13 | |
2010-05-24 | CCR adopted | |
2010-05-24 | CCR read | |
2010-05-24 | To Senate | |
2010-05-24 | Emergency failed: Ayes: 67 Nays: 33 | |
2010-05-24 | Motion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 65 Nays: 31 | |
2010-05-21 | Ayes: 61 Nays: 24 | |
2010-05-21 | Motion to suspend House Rule failed | |
2010-05-21 | Ayes: 57 Nays: 24 | |
2010-05-21 | Motion to reconsider tabled | |
2010-05-21 | Ayes: 68 Nays: 14 | |
2010-05-21 | House Rule suspended | |
2010-05-21 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Cox | |
2010-05-21 | Emergency failed: Ayes: 60 Nays: 31 | |
2010-05-21 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Cox | |
2010-05-21 | Measure passed: Ayes: 59 Nays: 33 | |
2010-05-21 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Lamons, Pittman, Cannaday | |
2010-05-21 | Ayes: 55 Nays: 31 | |
2010-05-21 | CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2010-05-21 | House Rule suspended | |
2010-05-21 | Enacting clause restored | |
2010-05-21 | Title restored | |
2010-05-21 | Remove as author Representative(s) Martin (Scott) | |
2010-05-21 | Remove Representative Miller as principal House author and substitute with Representative Cox | |
2010-05-21 | CCR submitted, GCCA | |
2010-05-21 | Withdrawn from GCCA; referred to conference; HC's named: Cox, Benge, Steele, Hickman, Morgan, Pruett | |
2010-05-21 | SCs named Johnson (Mike), Coffee, Laster | |
2010-05-21 | Withdrawn from GCCA - referred to conference | |
2010-05-06 | Conference granted, GCCA | |
2010-04-15 | SA's rejected, conference requested, GCCA | |
2010-03-30 | SA's received | |
2010-03-30 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-03-29 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-29 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | |
2010-03-29 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2010-03-29 | General Order, Amended | |
2010-02-09 | Direct to Calendar | |
2010-02-04 | First Reading | |
2010-02-04 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-02-03 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-02-03 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 4 | |
2010-02-03 | Title stricken | |
2010-02-03 | Amended | |
2010-02-03 | General Order | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading, direct to Calendar | |
2010-02-01 | Coauthored by Senator(s) Myers | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Johnson (Mike) (principal Senate author) | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Miller, Martin (Scott) | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 307 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 7101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 7102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 7103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 7104 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
86 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |