OK HB2435 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-08 - Approved by Governor 03/05/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-08 - Approved by Governor 03/05/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Director of the Office of the State Finance; directing to transfer funds to the Special Cash Fund. Emergency.
Title
Director of the Office of the State Finance; directing to transfer funds to the Special Cash Fund. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-25 - House - House: (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 70 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 70 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-08 | Approved by Governor 03/05/2010 | |
2010-03-04 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-03-04 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-03-04 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2010-03-03 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-03-03 | Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 43 Nays: 1 | |
2010-03-03 | Motion to reconsider vote adopted: Ayes: 43 Nays: 1 | |
2010-03-01 | Notice served to reconsider vote on emergency Coffee | |
2010-03-01 | Emergency failed: Ayes: 25 Nays: 21 | |
2010-03-01 | Measure passed: Ayes: 25 Nays: 21 | |
2010-03-01 | CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2010-02-25 | CCR read, GCCA | |
2010-02-25 | To Senate | |
2010-02-25 | Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 2 | |
2010-02-25 | CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2010-02-18 | Enacting clause restored | |
2010-02-18 | Title restored | |
2010-02-18 | CCR submitted, GCCA | |
2010-02-18 | Conference granted, GCCA | |
2010-02-17 | SA's rejected, conference requested, GCCA | |
2010-02-16 | SA's received | |
2010-02-16 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-02-16 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-02-16 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 6 | |
2010-02-16 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2010-02-16 | General Order, Amended | |
2010-02-09 | Direct to Calendar | |
2010-02-04 | First Reading | |
2010-02-04 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-02-03 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-02-03 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 20 | |
2010-02-03 | Title stricken | |
2010-02-03 | Amended | |
2010-02-03 | General Order | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading, direct to Calendar | |
2010-02-01 | Coauthored by Senator(s) Myers | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Johnson (Mike) (principal Senate author) | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Miller, Martin (Scott) | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
86 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |