OK HB2429 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2429
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Second Reading referred to Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Second Reading referred to Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Elections; authorizing certain data validation for citizenship status; requiring participation from state agencies; reporting; effective date.
Title
Elections; authorizing certain data validation for citizenship status; requiring participation from state agencies; reporting; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Sean Roberts [R] | Sen. Mark Allen [R] | Rep. Chad Caldwell [R] | Rep. Carl Newton [R] |
Rep. Lundy Kiger [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 66 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Kiger |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Newton |
2019-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 66 Nays: 26 |
2019-03-12 | House | Authored by Senator Allen (principal Senate author) |
2019-03-12 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Caldwell (Chad) |
2019-03-12 | House | General Order |
2019-02-28 | House | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Roberts (Sean) |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2429 (Carry Over) 2019-03-26 - Second Reading referred to Rules