OK HB2429 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Approved by Governor 04/18/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Approved by Governor 04/18/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Designating the SSGT Chaz Allen Highway and Spec 4 Randy Derrick Memorial Bridge; emergency.
Title
Designating the SSGT Chaz Allen Highway and Spec 4 Randy Derrick Memorial Bridge; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Approved by Governor 04/18/2012 | |
2012-04-12 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-04-12 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-04-12 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2012-04-11 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-04-11 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-04-11 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0 | |
2012-04-11 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-03-29 | coauthored by Condit | |
2012-03-29 | Reported Do Pass Transportation committee; CR filed | |
2012-03-15 | Second Reading referred to Transportation | |
2012-03-12 | First Reading | |
2012-03-12 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-03-08 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-08 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 2 | |
2012-03-08 | Amended | |
2012-03-08 | Authored by Senator Brecheen (principal Senate author) | |
2012-03-08 | General Order | |
2012-02-15 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Transportation | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Roan | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
69 | 1698 | 112 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 1698 | 113 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 1698 | 114 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 1698 | 115 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 1698 | 116 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |