OK HB2407 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-16 - Approved by Governor 04/16/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-16 - Approved by Governor 04/16/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Bail bondsmen; multicounty agent bondsman stating procedure for licensure and qualifications; effective date; emergency.
Title
Bail bondsmen; multicounty agent bondsman stating procedure for licensure and qualifications; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - House: General Government committee meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - House: General Government committee meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-16 | House | Approved by Governor 04/16/2014 |
2014-04-14 | House | Sent to Governor |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2014-04-14 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2014-04-10 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2014-04-10 | Senate | coauthored by Shortey |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 0 |
2014-04-10 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Business and Commerce |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Withdrawn from Appropriations committee |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Withdrawn from Business and Commerce committee |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2014-02-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-25 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-02-24 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-02-24 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 8 |
2014-02-24 | House | Authored by Senator Allen (principal Senate author) |
2014-02-24 | House | General Order |
2014-02-17 | House | Emergency added |
2014-02-17 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Bennett |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |