OK HB2398 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-7)
Status: Passed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Crimes and punishments; creating the Justice for J.W. Act of 2016; forcible sodomy; expanding scope of crime; emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crimes and punishments; creating the Justice for J.W. Act of 2016; forcible sodomy; expanding scope of crime; emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-23 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 39 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 74 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House: Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-27HouseApproved by Governor 06/06/2016
2016-05-24HouseSent to Governor
2016-05-24SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2016-05-24HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2016-05-23HouseReferred for enrollment
2016-05-23SenateMeasure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 39 Nays: 5
2016-05-23SenateCCR adopted, GCCA
2016-05-23Senatecoauthored by Dossett
2016-05-18SenateCCR read, GCCA
2016-05-18HouseTo Senate
2016-05-18HouseFourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 0
2016-05-18HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Floyd
2016-05-18HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Munson, Osborn, Perryman, Hall, Hoskin, Cockroft, Lepak
2016-05-18HouseCCR adopted
2016-05-16HouseEmergency added
2016-05-16HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Holt, Loveless
2016-05-16HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Murdock, Virgin, Montgomery, Walker, Roberts (Dustin)
2016-05-16HouseCCR submitted
2016-05-02SenateConference granted, GCCA
2016-04-26HouseSA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Criminal Justice and Corrections
2016-04-21HouseSA's received
2016-04-21SenateEngrossed to House
2016-04-20SenateReferred for engrossment
2016-04-20SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
2016-04-20SenateEnacting clause restored
2016-04-20SenateTitle restored
2016-04-20SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2016-04-07Senatecoauthored by Jordan
2016-04-07Senatecoauthored by Sanders
2016-04-06SenateEnacting clause stricken
2016-04-06SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
2016-04-04Senatecoauthored by Brooks
2016-03-31SenateReferred to Appropriations
2016-03-31SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed
2016-03-21SenateSecond Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2016-03-14SenateFirst Reading
2016-03-14HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2016-03-10HouseReferred for engrossment
2016-03-10HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 74 Nays: 4
2016-03-10HouseTitle stricken
2016-03-10HouseAmended
2016-03-10HouseGeneral Order
2016-02-24HouseAuthored by Senator Griffin (principal Senate author)
2016-02-24HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Tadlock
2016-02-24HouseCR; Do Pass Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee
2016-02-02HouseSecond Reading referred to Criminal Justice and Corrections
2016-02-01HouseAuthored by Representative Biggs
2016-02-01HouseFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
21142A13New CodeSee Bill Text
573601Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb2398&Session=1600
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20INT/hB/HB2398%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20ENGR/hB/HB2398%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCSH/HB2398%20SCSH.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/SFLR/HB2398%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/HFLR/HB2398%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB2398%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCCS/HB2398%20CCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20ENR/hB/HB2398%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2015-16%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/House/HB2398_votes.htm
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2015-16%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/Senate/HB2398_votes.htm

Bill Comments

feedback