OK HB2387 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-02 - Conference granted, GCCA
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-02 - Conference granted, GCCA
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Poor persons; authorizing Oklahoma Health Care Authority to seek waiver to expand premium assistance program to include certain full-time-equivalent employees; effective date.
Title
Poor persons; authorizing Oklahoma Health Care Authority to seek waiver to expand premium assistance program to include certain full-time-equivalent employees; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 61 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 61 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-02 | Senate | Conference granted, GCCA |
2016-04-26 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming GCCA |
2016-04-21 | House | SA's received |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 5 |
2016-04-20 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2016-03-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-03-09 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2016-03-08 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2016-03-08 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 16 |
2016-03-08 | House | Title stricken |
2016-03-08 | House | Amended |
2016-03-08 | House | Returned to General Order |
2016-03-08 | House | Motion to rescind Third Reading |
2016-03-08 | House | Motion to rescind the vote |
2016-03-08 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2016-03-08 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 61 Nays: 32 |
2016-03-08 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sherrer, Hoskin |
2016-03-08 | House | General Order |
2016-02-24 | House | Authored by Senator Griffin (principal Senate author) |
2016-02-24 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2016-02-16 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee |
2016-02-02 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee |
2016-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2016-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Griffith |
2016-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
56 | 1010 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
56 | 1010 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |