OK HB2374 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Professions and occupations; Oklahoma Pharmacy Act; modifying definition; effective date.
Title
Professions and occupations; Oklahoma Pharmacy Act; modifying definition; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-20 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House: Veterans & Military Affairs Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House: Veterans & Military Affairs Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | House | Approved by Governor 05/28/2014 |
2014-05-21 | House | Sent to Governor |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2014-05-21 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2014-05-20 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2014-05-20 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2014-05-15 | Senate | CCR read |
2014-05-15 | House | To Senate |
2014-05-15 | House | Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0 |
2014-05-15 | House | CCR adopted |
2014-05-08 | House | CCR submitted |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Simpson, Boggs, Allen, Sharp, Ivester, McAffrey |
2014-04-28 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs |
2014-04-15 | House | SA's received |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2014-04-14 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-03-26 | Senate | coauthored by Ivester |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs |
2014-03-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-11 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-10 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-10 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 2 |
2014-03-10 | House | Amended |
2014-03-10 | House | General Order |
2014-02-24 | House | Authored by Senator Simpson (principal Senate author) |
2014-02-24 | House | CR; Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Hardin |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |