OK HB2370 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Vetoed 06/10/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Status: Vetoed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Vetoed 06/10/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
State government; relating to full-time-equivalent employees; modifying date. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
State government; relating to full-time-equivalent employees; modifying date. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-28 - House - House: (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Vetoed 06/10/2010 | |
2010-05-28 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-28 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-05-28 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2010-05-28 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-28 | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 34 Nays: 13 | |
2010-05-28 | CCR adopted | |
2010-05-28 | CCR read | |
2010-05-28 | To Senate | |
2010-05-28 | Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-28 | CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2010-05-28 | Enacting clause restored | |
2010-05-28 | Title restored | |
2010-05-28 | CCR submitted, GCCA | |
2010-05-28 | SCs named Johnson (Mike), Coffee, Myers | |
2010-05-28 | Withdrawn from GCCA - referred to conference | |
2010-05-06 | Conference granted, GCCA | |
2010-04-15 | SA's rejected, conference requested, GCCA | |
2010-03-30 | SA's received | |
2010-03-30 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-03-29 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-29 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | |
2010-03-29 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2010-03-29 | General Order, Amended | |
2010-03-08 | Direct to Calendar | |
2010-02-16 | First Reading | |
2010-02-16 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-02-15 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-02-15 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 9 | |
2010-02-15 | Title stricken | |
2010-02-15 | Amended | |
2010-02-15 | General Order | |
2010-02-04 | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget, Direct to Calendar | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2010-02-01 | Coauthored by Senator(s) Myers | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Johnson (Mike) (principal Senate author) | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Miller, Martin (Scott) | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |