OK HB2368 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2368
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-11 - Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-11 - Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Agriculture; definition of Oklahoma certified beef; modifying definition; effective date.
Title
Agriculture; definition of Oklahoma certified beef; modifying definition; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Grego [R] | Sen. Casey Murdock [R] | Rep. Ty Burns [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Agriculture And Wildlife: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House: Agriculture and Rural Development Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House: Agriculture and Rural Development Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife |
2022-03-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-21 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-03-15 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-15 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 0 |
2022-03-15 | House | Authored by Senator Murdock (principal Senate author) |
2022-03-15 | House | General Order |
2022-03-02 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Burns |
2022-03-02 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture and Rural Development Committee |
2022-02-16 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Rural Development |
2022-02-16 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2022-02-14 | House | Remove Representative Kerbs as principal House author and substitute with Representative Grego |
2022-02-07 | House | Remove Representative Burns as principal House author and substitute with Representative Kerbs |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Burns |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2368 (Carry Over) 2021-02-02 - Second Reading referred to Rules