OK HB2365 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Laid over
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

State government; creating the Oklahoma Supplier Diversity Initiative; providing for qualifications; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State government; creating the Oklahoma Supplier Diversity Initiative; providing for qualifications; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate: RECONSIDER (Y: 36 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 19 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House: Government Modernization and Efficiency Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-03HouseLaid over
2021-05-03HouseSA's considered
2021-04-22HouseSA's received
2021-04-22SenateEngrossed to House
2021-04-21SenateReferred for engrossment
2021-04-21SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 12
2021-04-21SenateMotion to reconsider vote adopted: Ayes: 36 Nays: 11
2021-04-21SenateNotice served to reconsider vote on measure Coleman
2021-04-21SenateMeasure failed: Ayes: 19 Nays: 25
2021-04-21SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2021-04-08SenateTitle restored
2021-04-08SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
2021-03-22SenateCoauthored by Representative Pittman
2021-03-17SenateSecond Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
2021-03-11SenateFirst Reading
2021-03-11HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2021-03-10HouseReferred for engrossment
2021-03-10HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 1
2021-03-10HouseTitle stricken
2021-03-10HouseAmended
2021-03-10HouseHouse Rule suspended
2021-03-10HouseAuthored by Senator Coleman (principal Senate author)
2021-03-10HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Bell
2021-03-10HouseGeneral Order
2021-02-16HouseCR; Do Pass Government Modernization and Efficiency Committee
2021-02-02HouseSecond Reading referred to Government Modernization and Efficiency
2021-02-01HouseAuthored by Representative Burns
2021-02-01HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb2365&Session=2100
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20INT/hB/HB2365%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/HFLR/HB2365%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENGR/hB/HB2365%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCSH/HB2365%20SCSH.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/SFLR/HB2365%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB2365%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/House/HB2365%20FA1%20BURNSTY-LRB(UNTIMELY%20FILED).PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/House/HB2365%20FA2%20BURNSTY-LRB(UNTIMELY%20FILED).PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/House/HB2365%20FA3%20OSBURNMI-CC.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20AMENDMENTS/Senate/HB2365%20PCS.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20AMENDMENTS/Senate/HB2365%20CA1.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/Senate/HB2365%20(4-14-21)%20(COLEMAN)%20FS%20FA1.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2365%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2365%20FA1%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2365%20FA2%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/HB2365%20CS%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/HB2365%20FA1%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2365%20SAHB%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB2365_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB2365_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments 750

feedback