OK HB2360 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-24 - Approved by Governor 05/24/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Counties; modifying purchasing procedure for certain fire protection districts and fire departments; bond coverage or certain liability insurance; effective date; emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Counties; modifying purchasing procedure for certain fire protection districts and fire departments; bond coverage or certain liability insurance; effective date; emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-19 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-16 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House: Agriculture and Rural Development Committee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-24HouseApproved by Governor 05/24/2016
2016-05-20HouseSent to Governor
2016-05-20SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2016-05-20HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2016-05-19HouseReferred for enrollment
2016-05-19SenateMeasure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0
2016-05-19SenateCCR adopted
2016-05-16SenateCCR read
2016-05-16HouseTo Senate
2016-05-16HouseFourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0
2016-05-16HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Sherrer, Hoskin
2016-05-16HouseCCR adopted
2016-05-10HouseEmergency restored
2016-05-10HouseTitle restored
2016-05-10HouseCCR submitted
2016-04-27SenateConference granted, SCs named Barrington, Dahm, Brooks, Marlatt, Holt, Matthews, Floyd
2016-04-25HouseSA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Agriculture and Rural Development
2016-04-14HouseSA's received
2016-04-14SenateEngrossed to House
2016-04-13SenateReferred for engrossment
2016-04-13SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 0
2016-04-13SenateEmergency clause stricken
2016-04-13SenateTitle stricken
2016-04-13SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2016-03-28SenateReported Do Pass as amended General Government committee; CR filed
2016-03-16SenateSecond Reading referred to General Government
2016-03-08SenateFirst Reading
2016-03-08HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2016-03-07HouseReferred for engrossment
2016-03-07HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0
2016-03-07HouseAmended
2016-03-07HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Cockroft, Bennett
2016-03-07HouseGeneral Order
2016-02-10HouseAuthored by Senator Barrington (principal Senate author)
2016-02-10HouseCR; Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Development Committee
2016-02-02HouseSecond Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development
2016-02-01HouseAuthored by Representative Rousselot
2016-02-01HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb2360&Session=1600
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20INT/hB/HB2360%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/HFLR/HB2360%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20ENGR/hB/HB2360%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/SFLR/HB2360%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB2360%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCCS/HB2360%20CCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20ENR/hB/HB2360%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2015-16%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/House/HB2360_votes.htm
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2015-16%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/Senate/HB2360_votes.htm

Bill Comments

feedback