OK HB2358 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2358
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-15 - Approved by Governor 05/12/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-15 - Approved by Governor 05/12/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Motor Fuel Tax Code; deferral of remittance by eligible purchase; increasing remittance percentage basis; effective date.
Title
Motor Fuel Tax Code; deferral of remittance by eligible purchase; increasing remittance percentage basis; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 51 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 51 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-15 | House | Approved by Governor 05/12/2017 |
2017-05-08 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2017-05-08 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2017-05-04 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | JCR adopted |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2017-05-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-05-02 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-05-02 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-05-02 | House | Motion to reconsider tabled |
2017-05-02 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative West (Kevin) |
2017-05-02 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 51 Nays: 44 |
2017-05-02 | House | JCR adopted |
2017-05-02 | House | General Order |
2017-04-27 | House | JCR; Do pass, amended by committee substitute Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget |
2017-04-24 | House | Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget |
2017-04-20 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Fields |
2017-04-20 | House | Authored by Senator David (principal Senate author) |
2017-04-20 | House | Authored by Representative Osborn (Leslie), Wallace |
2017-04-20 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2358 (Carry Over) 2017-05-15 - Approved by Governor 05/12/2017