OK HB2356 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-08 - Approved by Governor 03/05/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-08 - Approved by Governor 03/05/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Department of Corrections; making an appropriation. Emergency.
Title
Department of Corrections; making an appropriation. Emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Wes Hilliard [D] | Sen. Mike Johnson [R] | Rep. Scott Martin [R] | Rep. Ken Miller [R] |
Sen. David Myers [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-02-25 - House - House: (Y: 89 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-08 | Approved by Governor 03/05/2010 | |
2010-03-03 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-03-03 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-03-03 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2010-03-02 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-03-01 | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | |
2010-03-01 | CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2010-02-25 | CCR read, GCCA | |
2010-02-25 | To Senate | |
2010-02-25 | Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 5 | |
2010-02-25 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hilliard | |
2010-02-25 | CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2010-02-18 | Enacting clause restored | |
2010-02-18 | Title restored | |
2010-02-18 | CCR submitted, GCCA | |
2010-02-18 | Conference granted, GCCA | |
2010-02-17 | SA's rejected, conference requested, GCCA | |
2010-02-16 | SA's received | |
2010-02-16 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-02-16 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-02-16 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 5 | |
2010-02-16 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2010-02-16 | General Order, Amended | |
2010-02-15 | Direct to Calendar | |
2010-02-15 | Senate Rule suspended | |
2010-02-11 | First Reading | |
2010-02-11 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-02-10 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-02-10 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 3 | |
2010-02-10 | Title stricken | |
2010-02-10 | Amended | |
2010-02-10 | General Order | |
2010-02-04 | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget, Direct to Calendar | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2010-02-01 | Coauthored by Senator(s) Myers | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Johnson (Mike) (principal Senate author) | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Miller, Martin (Scott) | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
86 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |