OK HB2350 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-24 - Authored by Senator Sykes (principal Senate author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-24 - Authored by Senator Sykes (principal Senate author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; ad valorem tax statements; incentive districts; increment districts; effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; ad valorem tax statements; incentive districts; increment districts; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-23 - House - House: County and Municipal Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-24 | House | Authored by Senator Sykes (principal Senate author) |
2016-02-24 | House | CR; Do Pass County and Municipal Government Committee |
2016-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to County and Municipal Government |
2016-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Roberts (Dustin) |
2016-02-01 | House | First Reading |