OK HB2347 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by Governor 04/18/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Lottery, Oklahoma Lottery Commission, modifying powers; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lottery, Oklahoma Lottery Commission, modifying powers; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House: Government Efficiency Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18HouseApproved by Governor 04/18/2019
2019-04-16HouseSent to Governor
2019-04-16SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2019-04-16HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2019-04-15HouseReferred for enrollment
2019-04-15SenateEngrossed measure signed, returned to House
2019-04-15SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
2019-04-15SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2019-03-28SenateReported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
2019-03-18SenateSecond Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
2019-02-13SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-13HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-02-12HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-02-12HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 2
2019-02-12HouseAuthored by Senator Bice (principal Senate author)
2019-02-12HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-06HouseCR; Do Pass Government Efficiency Committee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Government Efficiency
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Caldwell (Chad)
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback