OK HB2333 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/06/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/06/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Lotteries; relating to withholding in excess of prize; providing for withholding and payment of delinquent debt from the Oklahoma Employment Security Commission. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Lotteries; relating to withholding in excess of prize; providing for withholding and payment of delinquent debt from the Oklahoma Employment Security Commission. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-03 - House - House: (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-10 | Approved by Governor 05/06/2010 | |
2010-05-04 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-04 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-05-04 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2010-05-03 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-03 | Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 2 | |
2010-05-03 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Cox | |
2010-05-03 | SA's read, adopted | |
2010-04-15 | SA's received | |
2010-04-15 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-04-14 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-14 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2010-04-14 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-04-05 | remove as principal author Representative Murphey and substitute with Representative McDaniel (Randy) | |
2010-04-05 | Remove as author Senator Coates; authored by Senator Newberry | |
2010-04-05 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Labor committee; CR filed | |
2010-03-31 | Pending removal principal author Representative Murphey and replace with Representative McDaniel (Randy) | |
2010-03-31 | Pending coauthorship Senator(s) Coates | |
2010-03-30 | Pending coauthorship Senator(s) Newberry | |
2010-03-30 | Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Labor committee; pending CR | |
2010-03-08 | Second Reading referred to Business and Labor | |
2010-03-04 | First Reading | |
2010-03-04 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-03-03 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-03 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 5 | |
2010-03-03 | General Order | |
2010-02-24 | Authored by Senator Coates (principal Senate author) | |
2010-02-24 | CR; Do Pass Economic Development and Financial Services Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Economic Development and Financial Services | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Murphey | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3A | 724 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
3A | 724 | 4 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
40 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | ||
40 | 425 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |