OK HB2324 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-16 - Authored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-16 - Authored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public health and safety; creating the Prioritization of Public Funding in the Purchasing of Family Planning and Counseling Services Act; effective date.
Title
Public health and safety; creating the Prioritization of Public Funding in the Purchasing of Family Planning and Counseling Services Act; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-15 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-16 | Authored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author) | |
2012-02-16 | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Murphey | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |