OK HB2322 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Motor vehicles and motorcycles; modifying scope of definitions; creating the Casey Lewis Act. Effective date.
Title
Motor vehicles and motorcycles; modifying scope of definitions; creating the Casey Lewis Act. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Ellis [D] | Rep. Paul Roan [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-05-05 - House - House: (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-11 | Approved by Governor 05/10/2010 | |
2010-05-06 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-06 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-05-06 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2010-05-05 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-05 | Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-05 | SA's read, adopted | |
2010-04-15 | SA's received | |
2010-04-15 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-04-14 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-14 | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2010-04-14 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-03-31 | Reported Do Pass as amended Transportation committee; CR filed | |
2010-03-31 | Reported Do Pass as amended Transportation committee; pending CR | |
2010-03-08 | Second Reading referred to Transportation | |
2010-02-18 | First Reading | |
2010-02-18 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-02-17 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-02-17 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0 | |
2010-02-17 | General Order | |
2010-02-11 | Authored by Senator Ellis (principal Senate author) | |
2010-02-11 | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Roan | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
47 | 1 | 107 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 1 | 135 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 11 | 402 | New Code | See Bill Text |