OK HB2306 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Approved by Governor 06/08/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

Schools; modifying and deleting certain school review, reporting and recording requirements; school board members; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Schools; modifying and deleting certain school review, reporting and recording requirements; school board members; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-25 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-05-22 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 38 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 37) [PASS]
2012-05-22 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 60 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-25 Approved by Governor 06/08/2012
2012-05-25 Sent to Governor
2012-05-25 Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
2012-05-25 Enrolled, signed, to Senate
2012-05-25 Referred for enrollment
2012-05-25 Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
2012-05-25 CCR adopted
2012-05-24 CCR read
2012-05-24 To Senate
2012-05-24 Motion to reconsider tabled
2012-05-22 Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Coody
2012-05-22 Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 60 Nays: 28; Ayes: 38 Nays: 23
2012-05-22 CCR adopted
2012-05-17 Title restored
2012-05-17 CCR submitted
2012-05-03 Conference granted, SCs named Halligan, Ford, Barrington, Crain, Garrison, Paddack
2012-05-02 SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Education
2012-04-11 SA's received
2012-04-11 Engrossed to House
2012-04-10 Referred for engrossment
2012-04-10 Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0
2012-04-10 Title stricken
2012-04-10 General Order, Amended
2012-03-20 Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
2012-03-08 Second Reading referred to Education
2012-02-22 First Reading
2012-02-22 Engrossed, signed, to Senate
2012-02-21 Referred for engrossment
2012-02-21 Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0
2012-02-21 General Order
2012-02-15 Authored by Senator Halligan (principal Senate author)
2012-02-15 CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee
2012-02-07 Second Reading referred to Common Education
2012-02-06 Authored by Representative Coody
2012-02-06 First Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
701210508New CodeSee Bill Text
701210508CNew CodeSee Bill Text
7018153New CodeSee Bill Text
703104New CodeSee Bill Text
703153New CodeSee Bill Text
703156New CodeSee Bill Text
705110New CodeSee Bill Text
705117New CodeSee Bill Text
705142New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback