OK HB2297 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]

Summary

Intoxicating liquors; increasing penalties for underage drinking. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Intoxicating liquors; increasing penalties for underage drinking. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-02-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-28 Died in conference
2010-05-04 Conference granted, GCCA
2010-04-21 SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later
2010-04-15 SA's received
2010-04-15 Engrossed to House
2010-04-14 Referred for engrossment
2010-04-14 Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 4
2010-04-14 coauthored by Garrison
2010-04-14 General Order, Considered
2010-04-05 coauthored by Pittman
2010-04-05 Title stricken
2010-04-05 Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
2010-04-05 Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; pending CR
2010-03-24 Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary sub-committee
2010-03-11 Referred to Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary
2010-03-09 Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Pittman
2010-03-08 Second Reading referred to Appropriations
2010-02-16 First Reading
2010-02-16 Engrossed, signed, to Senate
2010-02-15 Referred for engrossment
2010-02-15 Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0
2010-02-15 Amended by floor substitute
2010-02-15 Authored by Senator Brown (principal Senate author)
2010-02-15 Coauthored by Representative(s) Kern, Ritze, Faught, Luttrell
2010-02-15 General Order
2010-02-09 Coauthored by Representative(s) Osborn, Kirby
2010-02-09 CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee
2010-02-02 Second Reading referred to Judiciary
2010-02-01 Authored by Representative Duncan
2010-02-01 First Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3782New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback