OK HB2286 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]

Summary

Marriage; division of certain military benefits; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Marriage; division of certain military benefits; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 57 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-25 Died in conference
2012-05-03 Conference granted, SCs named Russell, Sykes, Simpson, Treat, Ivester, Laster
2012-04-25 SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Public Safety, Judiciary and Military Affairs
2012-04-12 SA's received
2012-04-12 Engrossed to House
2012-04-11 Referred for engrossment
2012-04-11 Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0
2012-04-11 Title stricken
2012-04-11 General Order, Amended
2012-03-29 Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed
2012-03-15 Second Reading referred to Judiciary
2012-03-08 First Reading
2012-03-08 Engrossed, signed, to Senate
2012-03-07 Referred for engrossment
2012-03-07 Motion to reconsider tabled
2012-03-07 Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Virgin
2012-03-07 Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 57 Nays: 38
2012-03-07 General Order
2012-02-21 Authored by Senator Russell (principal Senate author)
2012-02-21 CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee
2012-02-07 Second Reading referred to Judiciary
2012-02-06 Authored by Representative Virgin
2012-02-06 First Reading

Subjects


Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback