OK HB2275 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Criminal procedure; directing the Community Sentencing Division of the Department of Corrections to annually submit certain statistical data to the Legislature and Governor; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal procedure; directing the Community Sentencing Division of the Department of Corrections to annually submit certain statistical data to the Legislature and Governor; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House: Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee: DO PASS (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-06SenateReported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
2021-03-15SenateSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2021-03-09SenateFirst Reading
2021-03-09HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2021-03-08HouseReferred for engrossment
2021-03-08HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0
2021-03-08HouseGeneral Order
2021-02-25HouseAuthored by Senator Pemberton (principal Senate author)
2021-02-25HouseCR; Do Pass Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee
2021-02-08HouseReferred to Criminal Justice and Corrections
2021-02-08HouseWithdrawn from Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2021-02-02HouseSecond Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal
2021-02-01HouseAuthored by Representative West (Josh)
2021-02-01HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback