OK HB2274 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

Schools; expanding uses of building funds for school districts and technology center school districts. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Schools; expanding uses of building funds for school districts and technology center school districts. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-05-24 - House - House: (Y: 71 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-28 Approved by Governor 06/06/2010
2010-05-26 Sent to Governor
2010-05-26 Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
2010-05-26 Enrolled, signed, to Senate
2010-05-25 Referred for enrollment
2010-05-25 Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 45 Nays: 2
2010-05-25 CCR adopted, GCCA
2010-05-24 CCR read, GCCA
2010-05-24 To Senate
2010-05-24 Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 71 Nays: 22
2010-05-24 CCR adopted
2010-05-20 Title restored
2010-05-20 CCR submitted
2010-05-03 HC's named: Thomsen, Nations, Denney, Hilliard, McCullough, Wright (Harold)
2010-04-28 Conference granted, GCCA
2010-04-26 SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later
2010-04-07 SA's received
2010-04-07 Engrossed to House
2010-04-06 Referred for engrossment
2010-04-06 Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
2010-04-06 coauthored by Garrison, Johnson (Constance)
2010-04-06 General Order, Considered
2010-03-29 Title stricken
2010-03-29 Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
2010-03-25 Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; pending CR
2010-03-22 Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-Education sub-committee
2010-03-11 Referred to Appr/Sub-Education
2010-03-08 Second Reading referred to Appropriations
2010-02-24 First Reading
2010-02-24 Engrossed, signed, to Senate
2010-02-23 Referred for engrossment
2010-02-23 Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 10
2010-02-23 Authored by Senator Anderson (principal Senate author)
2010-02-23 Coauthored by Representative(s) Pittman, Cannaday, Smithson, Walker
2010-02-23 General Order
2010-02-03 CR; Do Pass Higher Education and Career Tech Committee
2010-02-02 Second Reading referred to Higher Education and Career Tech
2010-02-01 Authored by Representative Thomsen
2010-02-01 First Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
701118New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback