OK HB2270 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2270
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-29 - Authored by Senator Hamilton (principal Senate author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-29 - Authored by Senator Hamilton (principal Senate author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Wildlife; creating the Oklahoma Habitat Stamp; non-residents; stamp exceptions; purchase amount; limitations on uses for monies received from purchase; effective date.
Title
Wildlife; creating the Oklahoma Habitat Stamp; non-residents; stamp exceptions; purchase amount; limitations on uses for monies received from purchase; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-28 - House - House: Wildlife Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-29 | House | Authored by Senator Hamilton (principal Senate author) |
2024-02-29 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Wildlife Committee |
2024-02-19 | House | Referred to Wildlife |
2024-02-19 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2024-02-13 | House | Remove Representative Burns as principal House author and substitute with Representative West (Rick) |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Burns |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2270 (Carry Over) 2023-02-07 - Second Reading referred to Rules