OK HB2267 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public health and safety; extending termination date of supplemental hospital offset payment program fee; effective date.
Title
Public health and safety; extending termination date of supplemental hospital offset payment program fee; effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Ron Justice [R] | Rep. Doug Cox [R] | Rep. Ben Sherrer [D] | Rep. John Bennett [R] |
Sen. Corey Brooks [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-26 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 38 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-23 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 86 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-23 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 86 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-27 | House | Approved by Governor 06/06/2016 |
2016-05-26 | House | Sent to Governor |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2016-05-26 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2016-05-26 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 38 Nays: 8 |
2016-05-26 | Senate | CCR adopted, GCCA |
2016-05-23 | Senate | CCR read, GCCA |
2016-05-23 | House | To Senate |
2016-05-23 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 7 |
2016-05-23 | House | CCR adopted |
2016-05-19 | House | Title restored |
2016-05-19 | House | CCR submitted |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Conference granted, GCCA |
2016-05-04 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming GCCA |
2016-04-21 | House | SA's received |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 7 |
2016-04-20 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2016-03-31 | Senate | coauthored by Brooks |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Title stricken |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2016-03-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-03-02 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2016-03-01 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2016-03-01 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 7 |
2016-03-01 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sherrer |
2016-03-01 | House | General Order |
2016-02-24 | House | Authored by Senator Justice (principal Senate author) |
2016-02-24 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Bennett |
2016-02-24 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2016-02-16 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee |
2016-02-02 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee |
2016-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2016-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Cox |
2016-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
63 | 3241 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 3241 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 3241 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |