OK HB2267 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-15 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-15 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public health and safety; modifying legislative intent relating to tobacco restriction preemption; effective date.
Title
Public health and safety; modifying legislative intent relating to tobacco restriction preemption; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 57 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - House: ADOPT AMENDMENT (Y: 43 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - House: TABLE (Y: 43 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - House: ADOPT AMENDMENT (Y: 43 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - House: TABLE (Y: 43 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-15 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | |
2012-03-07 | First Reading | |
2012-03-07 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-03-06 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-06 | Motion expired | |
2012-03-01 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Stiles | |
2012-03-01 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 57 Nays: 30 | |
2012-03-01 | Amended | |
2012-03-01 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Ritze | |
2012-03-01 | General Order | |
2012-02-23 | Coauthored by Senator(s) Burrage | |
2012-02-23 | Authored by Senator Simpson (principal Senate author) | |
2012-02-23 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Cannaday, Lockhart, Denney, Wright, Scott, Liebmann, Morgan, Pittman | |
2012-02-23 | CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Public Health | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Cox | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |