OK HB2266 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-01 - Approved by Governor 05/01/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-01 - Approved by Governor 05/01/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public health and safety; creating the Public Health Delivery Act; emergency.
Title
Public health and safety; creating the Public Health Delivery Act; emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Doug Cox [R] | Sen. Kim David [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 75 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 70 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 75 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 70 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-01 | Approved by Governor 05/01/2012 | |
2012-04-30 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-04-30 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-04-26 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2012-04-25 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-04-25 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-04-25 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | |
2012-04-25 | Amendment restored bill to engrossed version | |
2012-04-25 | Title restored | |
2012-04-25 | General Order, Amended | |
2012-03-27 | Title stricken | |
2012-03-27 | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | |
2012-03-15 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | |
2012-03-13 | First Reading | |
2012-03-13 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-03-12 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-12 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 18 | |
2012-03-12 | Amended | |
2012-03-12 | House Rule suspended | |
2012-03-12 | General Order | |
2012-02-15 | Authored by Senator David (principal Senate author) | |
2012-02-15 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Public Health | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Cox | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |