OK HB2266 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Vetoed 06/09/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

Criminal procedure; relating to the manner and procedures for inflicting death punishment; clarifying procedure for death punishment; relating to the Indigent Defense Act; modifying scope of responsibilities of the Indigent Defense System; relating to the Oklahoma Criminal Discovery Code; providing exception to certain disclosure requirement. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal procedure; relating to the manner and procedures for inflicting death punishment; clarifying procedure for death punishment; relating to the Indigent Defense Act; modifying scope of responsibilities of the Indigent Defense System; relating to the Oklahoma Criminal Discovery Code; providing exception to certain disclosure requirement. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-05-28 - House - House: (Y: 63 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2009-02-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-28 Vetoed 06/09/2010
2010-05-28 Sent to Governor
2010-05-28 Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
2010-05-28 Enrolled, signed, to Senate
2010-05-28 Referred for enrollment
2010-05-28 Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0
2010-05-28 2 CCR adopted
2010-05-28 2 CCR read
2010-05-28 To Senate
2010-05-28 Measure passed: Ayes: 63 Nays: 33
2010-05-28 Coauthored by Representative(s) Duncan
2010-05-28 2 CCR adopted
2010-05-25 2 CCR submitted
2010-05-13 Further conference granted, same conferees
2010-05-12 CCR rejected, further conference requested, same conferees
2010-05-11 Title restored
2010-05-11 CCR submitted
2010-05-10 HC's named: Christian, Proctor, Terrill, Kirby, Dorman
2010-03-09 Conference granted, SCs named Sykes, Lamb, Johnson (Mike), Reynolds
2010-02-23 SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later
2009-04-15 SA's received
2009-04-15 Engrossed to House
2009-04-14 Referred for engrossment
2009-04-14 Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0
2009-04-14 coauthored by Reynolds
2009-04-14 Remove as author Senator Reynolds; authored by Senator Sykes
2009-04-14 Remove as coauthor Senator Sykes
2009-04-14 General Order, Considered
2009-04-06 coauthored by Sykes
2009-04-06 Title stricken
2009-04-06 Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
2009-04-02 Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; pending CR
2009-04-02 Pending coauthorship Senator(s) Sykes
2009-03-30 Referred to Appropriations
2009-03-30 Withdrawn from Judiciary committee
2009-03-12 Second Reading referred to Judiciary
2009-02-18 First Reading
2009-02-18 Engrossed, signed, to Senate
2009-02-17 Referred for engrossment
2009-02-17 Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 16
2009-02-17 Authored by Senator Reynolds (principal Senate author)
2009-02-17 Coauthored by Representative(s) Terrill, Wright (John)
2009-02-17 General Order
2009-02-05 Coauthored by Representative(s) Sullivan
2009-02-05 CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee
2009-02-03 Second Reading referred to Judiciary
2009-02-02 Authored by Representative Christian
2009-02-02 First Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221014New CodeSee Bill Text
221015New CodeSee Bill Text
2213556New CodeSee Bill Text
222002New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback