OK HB2250 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Animal rights charitable organizations; prohibiting the solicitation of contributions intended for out-of-state or for political purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Animal rights charitable organizations; prohibiting the solicitation of contributions intended for out-of-state or for political purposes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-01 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 50 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 56 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House: Agriculture and Rural Development Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-10SenateSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2016-03-02SenateFirst Reading
2016-03-02HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2016-03-01HouseReferred for engrossment
2016-03-01HouseThird Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 56 Nays: 26; Ayes: 50 Nays: 24
2016-03-01HouseAmended
2016-03-01HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Tadlock, Biggs
2016-03-01HouseGeneral Order
2016-02-15HouseEmergency added
2016-02-15HouseAuthored by Senator Boggs (principal Senate author)
2016-02-15HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture and Rural Development Committee
2016-02-02HouseSecond Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development
2016-02-01HouseAuthored by Representative Renegar, Enns
2016-02-01HouseFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
185541Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback