OK HB2250 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-15 - Approved by Governor 05/15/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-15 - Approved by Governor 05/15/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Motor vehicles; requiring consideration of weighing area levelness; effective date; emergency.
Title
Motor vehicles; requiring consideration of weighing area levelness; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-08 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-15 | Approved by Governor 05/15/2012 | |
2012-05-09 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-05-09 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-05-09 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2012-05-08 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-05-08 | Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 | |
2012-05-08 | SA's read, adopted | |
2012-04-30 | SA's received | |
2012-04-30 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-04-25 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-04-25 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2012-04-25 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-04-03 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed | |
2012-03-08 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | |
2012-03-06 | First Reading | |
2012-03-06 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-03-05 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-05 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 | |
2012-03-05 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Walker | |
2012-03-05 | General Order | |
2012-02-28 | Authored by Senator Marlatt (principal Senate author) | |
2012-02-28 | Coauthored by Representative(s) McNiel | |
2012-02-28 | CR; Do Pass Transportation Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Transportation | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Shannon | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
47 | 14 | 111 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 6 | 117 | New Code | See Bill Text |