OK HB2249 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles; maintenance and construction zones; making certain acts unlawful; emergency.
Title
Motor vehicles; maintenance and construction zones; making certain acts unlawful; emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Renegar [D] | Sen. J.J. Dossett [D] | Rep. Ben Sherrer [D] | Rep. Jerry Shoemake [D] |
Rep. Chuck Hoskin [D] | Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-24 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 34 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-27 | House | Approved by Governor 06/06/2016 |
2016-05-25 | House | Sent to Governor |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2016-05-25 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2016-05-24 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 34 Nays: 9 |
2016-05-24 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2016-05-18 | Senate | CCR read |
2016-05-18 | House | To Senate |
2016-05-18 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0 |
2016-05-18 | House | CCR adopted |
2016-05-05 | House | Emergency restored |
2016-05-05 | House | Title restored |
2016-05-05 | House | CCR submitted |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Dossett, Barrington, Brooks, David, Marlatt, Stanislawski, Wyrick |
2016-04-26 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Public Safety |
2016-04-21 | House | SA's received |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Motion expired |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Dossett |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 6 |
2016-04-20 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Title stricken |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2016-03-22 | Senate | coauthored by Pittman |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2016-03-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-03-03 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2016-03-02 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2016-03-02 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 10 |
2016-03-02 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hoskin, Sherrer |
2016-03-02 | House | General Order |
2016-02-22 | House | Emergency added |
2016-02-22 | House | Authored by Senator Dossett (principal Senate author) |
2016-02-22 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Shoemake |
2016-02-22 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee |
2016-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2016-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Renegar |
2016-02-01 | House | First Reading |