OK HB2247 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-28 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-28 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Public retirement systems; Experienced Teacher Support Act; Teachers' Retirement System of Oklahoma; postretirement earnings limit; effective date.
Title
Public retirement systems; Experienced Teacher Support Act; Teachers' Retirement System of Oklahoma; postretirement earnings limit; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House: Business, Labor and Retirement Laws Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House: Business, Labor and Retirement Laws Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-28 | Senate | Title stricken |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Pensions committee; CR filed |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Pensions |
2016-02-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-02-11 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2016-02-10 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2016-02-10 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 2 |
2016-02-10 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Cockroft |
2016-02-10 | House | General Order |
2016-02-02 | House | Authored by Senator Smalley (principal Senate author) |
2016-02-02 | House | CR; Do Pass Business, Labor and Retirement Laws Committee |
2016-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Business, Labor and Retirement Laws |
2016-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative McDaniel (Randy) |
2016-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 17 | 108 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 17 | 116 | New Code | See Bill Text |