OK HB2240 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Approved by Governor 06/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Approved by Governor 06/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Department of Mental Health and Substance Abuse Services; authorizing transfers, exempting certain funds from expenditure and budgetary limitations.
Title
Department of Mental Health and Substance Abuse Services; authorizing transfers, exempting certain funds from expenditure and budgetary limitations.
Sponsors
Sen. Clark Jolley [R] | Rep. Earl Sears [R] | Rep. Dennis Casey [R] | Sen. Greg Treat [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-22 | House | Approved by Governor 06/01/2015 |
2015-05-22 | House | Sent to Governor |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2015-05-22 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2015-05-22 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0 |
2015-05-22 | Senate | JCR adopted |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2015-05-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-05-20 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-05-20 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-05-20 | House | Motion to reconsider tabled |
2015-05-20 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Cox |
2015-05-20 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 13 |
2015-05-20 | House | JCR adopted |
2015-05-20 | House | General Order |
2015-05-20 | House | Emergency removed |
2015-05-20 | House | JCR; Do pass, amended by committee substitute Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget |
2015-05-14 | House | Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget |
2015-05-13 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Treat |
2015-05-13 | House | Authored by Senator Jolley (principal Senate author) |
2015-05-13 | House | Authored by Representative Sears, Casey |
2015-05-13 | House | First Reading |