OK HB2218 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2218
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Criminal procedure; fines, costs and fees; nonpayment; waiving in certain circumstances; sentencing; probation; effective date.
Title
Criminal procedure; fines, costs and fees; nonpayment; waiving in certain circumstances; sentencing; probation; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-23 | House | Died in conference |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Jech, Daniels, Bice, Coleman, Brooks, Floyd, Shaw, Matthews |
2019-05-01 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Judiciary |
2019-04-29 | House | SA's received |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-04-15 | Senate | coauthored by Dunnington |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2019-03-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-11 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-07 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 9 |
2019-03-07 | House | Title stricken |
2019-03-07 | House | Amended |
2019-03-07 | House | Authored by Senator Jech (principal Senate author) |
2019-03-07 | House | General Order |
2019-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative May |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2218 (Carry Over) 2019-05-23 - Died in conference