OK HB2197 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-23 - Approved by Governor 04/23/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-23 - Approved by Governor 04/23/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
State government; creating the Strategic Cost Reduction and Saving Act; codification.
Title
State government; creating the Strategic Cost Reduction and Saving Act; codification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 63 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - House: Government Modernization Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 63 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - House: Government Modernization Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-23 | Approved by Governor 04/23/2012 | |
2012-04-17 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-04-17 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-04-17 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2012-04-16 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-04-16 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-04-16 | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 1 | |
2012-04-16 | Amendment restored bill to engrossed version | |
2012-04-16 | Title restored | |
2012-04-16 | General Order, Amended | |
2012-04-16 | Senate Rule suspended | |
2012-04-09 | Title stricken | |
2012-04-09 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2012-03-15 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2012-03-12 | First Reading | |
2012-03-12 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-03-08 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-08 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 63 Nays: 28 | |
2012-03-08 | General Order | |
2012-03-05 | Authored by Senator Brecheen (principal Senate author) | |
2012-03-05 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Government Modernization Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Government Modernization | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Murphey | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
62 | 34 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 500 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 61 | 8 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 85 | 3A | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 85 | 45k | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 85 | 7h | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 85 | 7I | Amended Code | See Bill Text |