OK HB2191 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB2191

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-02-05 - Remove as author Senator Rader; authored by Senator Dugger
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Bicycles; due care when passing; fine amounts; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bicycles; due care when passing; fine amounts; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 53 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-05SenateRemove as author Senator Rader; authored by Senator Dugger
2017-03-27SenateSecond Reading referred to Public Safety
2017-03-21SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-21HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2017-03-20HouseReferred for engrossment
2017-03-20HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 53 Nays: 33
2017-03-20HouseAmended
2017-03-20HouseHouse Rule suspended
2017-03-20HouseAuthored by Senator Rader (principal Senate author)
2017-03-20HouseGeneral Order
2017-02-23HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Bush
2017-02-23HouseCR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee
2017-02-07HouseSecond Reading referred to Public Safety
2017-02-06HouseAuthored by Representative Williams
2017-02-06HouseFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

HB2191 (Carry Over) 2017-03-27 - Second Reading referred to Public Safety

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
47111208New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback