OK HB2186 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2186
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Alcoholic beverages; motion picture theatres; definitions; licensing; repealer; effective date.
Title
Alcoholic beverages; motion picture theatres; definitions; licensing; repealer; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-26 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 26 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 60 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 33 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 60 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - House - House: ADOPT AMENDMENT (Y: 72 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 60 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 33 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 60 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - House - House: ADOPT AMENDMENT (Y: 72 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-26 | House | Approved by Governor 06/06/2017 |
2017-05-26 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2017-05-26 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2017-05-26 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 26 Nays: 17 |
2017-05-26 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2017-05-22 | Senate | coauthored by Williams |
2017-05-22 | Senate | CCR read |
2017-05-22 | House | To Senate |
2017-05-22 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 60 Nays: 33 |
2017-05-22 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Lowe |
2017-05-22 | House | CCR adopted |
2017-05-17 | House | Title restored |
2017-05-17 | House | Remove Representative Williams as principal House author and substitute with Representative Henke |
2017-05-17 | House | Remove as coauthor Representative(s) Henke |
2017-05-17 | House | CCR submitted |
2017-05-10 | Senate | SCs changed Holt, Newberry, Treat, Paxton, Scott, Pittman, Sparks to Holt, Dahm, Brecheen, Sykes, Newberry, Dossett, Matthews |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Holt, Newberry, Treat, Paxton, Scott, Pittman, Sparks |
2017-05-01 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2017-04-27 | House | SA's received |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 11 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Sharp |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Business, Commerce and Tourism committee; CR filed |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Pittman |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2017-03-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-14 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-03-13 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-13 | House | Motion expired |
2017-03-08 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Williams |
2017-03-08 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 60 Nays: 36 |
2017-03-08 | House | Amended |
2017-03-08 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) McDugle, Roberts (Dustin), Murdock, Osborn (Leslie) |
2017-03-08 | House | General Order |
2017-02-15 | House | Authored by Senator Holt (principal Senate author) |
2017-02-15 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Henke |
2017-02-15 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Williams |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2186 (Carry Over) 2017-05-26 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2017
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37 | 163 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 163 | 25 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
37A | 1 | 103 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37A | 2 | 110 | New Code | See Bill Text |