OK HB2184 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Approved by Governor 05/24/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

Poor persons; requiring plan for closure of resource centers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Poor persons; requiring plan for closure of resource centers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-05-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-20 - Senate - Senate: MOTION (Y: 28 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 52 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - House - House: C (Y: 52 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - House - House: Joint Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-20 Approved by Governor 05/24/2011
2011-05-20 Sent to Governor
2011-05-20 Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
2011-05-20 Enrolled, signed, to Senate
2011-05-20 Referred for enrollment
2011-05-20 Engrossed to House
2011-05-20 Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 6
2011-05-20 JCR adopted
2011-05-19 Direct to Calendar
2011-05-18 First Reading
2011-05-18 Engrossed, signed, to Senate
2011-05-18 Referred for engrossment
2011-05-18 Motion to reconsider tabled
2011-05-18 Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Peters
2011-05-18 Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 52 Nays: 48
2011-05-18 Ayes: 52 Nays: 43
2011-05-18 JCR adopted
2011-05-18 General Order
2011-05-17 Remove as author Representative(s) Martin (Scott)
2011-05-17 JCR; Do Pass Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget
2011-05-17 Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget
2011-05-16 Coauthored by Senator(s) Jolley
2011-05-16 Authored by Senator Myers (principal Senate author)
2011-05-16 Authored by Representative Sears, Martin (Scott)
2011-05-16 First Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
563050Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
563051Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback