OK HB2178 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2178
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Approved by Governor 05/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Approved by Governor 05/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Alcoholic beverages; small farm winery or winemaker license; samples; satellite locations; events; effective date.
Title
Alcoholic beverages; small farm winery or winemaker license; samples; satellite locations; events; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Dick Lowe [R] | Sen. Lonnie Paxton [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Business & Commerce: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 71 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - House: Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Business & Commerce: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 71 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - House: Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | House | Approved by Governor 05/01/2024 |
2024-04-29 | House | Sent to Governor |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2024-04-29 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2024-04-25 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 2 |
2024-04-25 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2023-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-09 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 71 Nays: 9 |
2023-03-09 | House | General Order |
2023-03-02 | House | Authored by Senator Paxton (principal Senate author) |
2023-03-02 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Lowe (Dick) |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2178 (Carry Over) 2023-04-10 - Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed