OK HB2165 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-06 - Rejection of SA's and request for conference rescinded
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-06 - Rejection of SA's and request for conference rescinded
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Condemnation; mandating award of costs and attorney fees; adding the right to demand a jury trial in certain proceedings; effective date.
Title
Condemnation; mandating award of costs and attorney fees; adding the right to demand a jury trial in certain proceedings; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 60 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House: Judiciary and Civil Procedure Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 60 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House: Judiciary and Civil Procedure Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-06 | House | Rejection of SA's and request for conference rescinded |
2015-05-06 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Judiciary and Civil Procedure |
2015-04-27 | House | SA's received |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2015-03-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-05 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-03-04 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-04 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 60 Nays: 31 |
2015-03-04 | House | Title stricken |
2015-03-04 | House | Amended |
2015-03-04 | House | General Order |
2015-02-25 | House | Authored by Senator Sykes (principal Senate author) |
2015-02-25 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary and Civil Procedure Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary and Civil Procedure |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative McCullough |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |