OK HB2154 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-2)
Status: Passed on April 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-30 - Approved by Governor 04/30/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Public health and safety; creating Katie and Cayman's Law; providing for the establishment of statewide investigational new drug applications for certain clinical trials; emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public health and safety; creating Katie and Cayman's Law; providing for the establishment of statewide investigational new drug applications for certain clinical trials; emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-30HouseApproved by Governor 04/30/2015
2015-04-29HouseSent to Governor
2015-04-29SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2015-04-29HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2015-04-28HouseReferred for enrollment
2015-04-28HouseFourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 5
2015-04-28HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Brinkley, Shortey
2015-04-28HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Nelson
2015-04-28HouseSA's read, adopted
2015-04-16HouseSA's received
2015-04-16SenateEngrossed to House
2015-04-15SenateReferred for engrossment
2015-04-15SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
2015-04-15SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2015-04-15SenateSenate Rule suspended
2015-04-13Senatecoauthored by Yen, Newberry
2015-04-07Senatecoauthored by Sharp
2015-04-06Senatecoauthored by Standridge
2015-04-06SenateReported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
2015-03-05SenateSecond Reading referred to Health and Human Services
2015-03-03Senatecoauthored by Nollan
2015-02-12Senatecoauthored by Roberts (Sean), Perryman
2015-02-12SenateFirst Reading
2015-02-12HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2015-02-11HouseReferred for engrossment
2015-02-11HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 99 Nays: 2
2015-02-11HouseEmergency added
2015-02-11HouseAmended
2015-02-11HouseHouse Rule suspended
2015-02-11HouseAmended
2015-02-11HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Montgomery, Casey, Jordan, Cannaday
2015-02-11HouseGeneral Order
2015-02-04HouseAuthored by Senator Crain (principal Senate author)
2015-02-04HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Grau
2015-02-04HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Alcohol, Tobacco, and Controlled Substances Committee
2015-02-03HouseSecond Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco, and Controlled Substances
2015-02-02HouseAuthored by Representative Echols
2015-02-02HouseFirst Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
632101New CodeSee Bill Text
632801Amended CodeSee Bill Text
632802Amended CodeSee Bill Text
632803Amended CodeSee Bill Text
632804Amended CodeSee Bill Text
632805Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb2154&Session=1600
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20INT/hB/HB2154%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/HFLR/HB2154%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB2154%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20ENGR/hB/HB2154%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/SFLR/HB2154%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB2154%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20ENR/hB/HB2154%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2015-16%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/Senate/HB2154_votes.htm

Bill Comments 750

feedback