OK HB2132 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2132
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-28 - Second Reading referred to Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-28 - Second Reading referred to Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prosperity districts; providing for creation; procedures; compact.
Title
Prosperity districts; providing for creation; procedures; compact.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 60 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 51 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House: Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 51 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House: Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2017-03-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-23 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-03-22 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-22 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 60 Nays: 26 |
2017-03-22 | House | Title stricken |
2017-03-22 | House | Amended |
2017-03-22 | House | Authored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author) |
2017-03-22 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Dunlap |
2017-03-22 | House | General Order |
2017-03-02 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee |
2017-02-23 | House | Referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2017-02-23 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative McCall |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2132 (Carry Over) 2017-03-28 - Second Reading referred to Rules